Bill Texts Received Today

Congress.gov checks for new texts from the Congressional Bills series on GPO's FDsys throughout the day. Shortly after a text is available from GPO it will be available on Congress.gov. Texts usually are available from this list, and from a bill's Text tab a day or two after being introduced. Delays can occur when there is a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed quickly. Find texts received on other dates using Advanced Search - Query Builder.

20 bill texts were received on July 25, 2017

  
Bill Text Version
H.Res.470 [115th] - Recognizing that international education and exchange programs further national security and foreign policy priorities, enhance economic competitiveness, and promote mutual understanding and cooperation among nations. Introduced in House (07/24/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.Res.471 [115th] - Recognizing the 100th anniversary of the Hiram M. Chittenden Locks, in Ballard, Washington. Introduced in House (07/24/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.Res.468 [115th] - Providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 111) providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the rule submitted by Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection relating to "Arbitration Agreements". Reported in House (07/24/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.R.3358 [115th] - Departments of Labor, Health and Human Services, and Education, and Related Agencies Appropriations Act, 2018 Reported in House (07/24/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.R.3362 [115th] - Department of State, Foreign Operations, and Related Programs Appropriations Act, 2018 Reported in House (07/24/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.R.3364 [115th] - Countering America's Adversaries Through Sanctions Act Introduced in House (07/24/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.Res.472 [115th] - Expressing support for the designation of July 29, 2017, as "National Dance Day" and recognizing dance as a form of valuable exercise and artistic expression. Introduced in House (07/24/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.R.3285 [115th] - Sustainable, Affordable, Fair, and Efficient (SAFE) National Flood Insurance Program Reauthorization Act of 2017 Introduced in House (07/18/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.R.3261 [115th] - North Korea Follow the Money Act Introduced in House (07/14/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.R.3223 [115th] - To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the statute of limitations on making a claim for credit or refund and shorten the statute of limitations on collection after assessment. Introduced in House (07/13/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.R.3218 [115th] - Harry W. Colmery Veterans Educational Assistance Act of 2017 Reported in House (07/24/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.R.3180 [115th] - Intelligence Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018 Reported in House (07/24/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.R.2772 [115th] - SEA Act Reported in House (07/24/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.R.2781 [115th] - Ensuring Veteran Enterprise Participation in Strategic Sourcing Act Introduced in House (06/06/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.R.2749 [115th] - Protecting Business Opportunities for Veterans Act of 2017 Introduced in House (05/26/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.R.2006 [115th] - VA Procurement Efficiency and Transparency Act Reported in House (07/24/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.R.1927 [115th] - African American Civil Rights Network Act of 2017 Reported in House (07/24/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.R.1690 [115th] - Department of Veterans Affairs Bonus Transparency Act Reported in House (07/24/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
S.249 [115th] - A bill to provide that the pueblo of Santa Clara may lease for 99 years certain restricted land, and for other purposes. Reported in House (07/24/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF
H.R.282 [115th] - Military Residency Choice Act Reported in House (07/24/2017):
XML/HTML | TXT | PDF