Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 02/10/1987
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 02/10/1987
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 02/10/1987
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/25/1987
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 03/11/1987
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 03/11/1987
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 03/17/1987
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/17/1987
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 03/17/1987
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/25/1987
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/25/1987
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/25/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 03/25/1987