Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 02/09/1987
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 03/30/1987
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/21/1987
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/11/1987
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 05/11/1987
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 05/28/1987
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 07/08/1987
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 12/22/1987
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 09/22/1988