Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 02/11/1987
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 02/11/1987
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/11/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 03/11/1987
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/11/1987
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 03/11/1987
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 03/11/1987
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/11/1987
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 03/11/1987
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/11/1987
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 03/11/1987
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 03/11/1987
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 03/11/1987
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/11/1987
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 03/11/1987
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 03/11/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/11/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 03/11/1987
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 03/11/1987
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-42] 03/11/1987
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/11/1987
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/11/1987
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 03/11/1987
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/11/1987
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 04/01/1987
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 04/01/1987
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 04/01/1987
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 04/01/1987
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 04/01/1987
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 04/01/1987
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 04/01/1987
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/01/1987
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/01/1987
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 04/01/1987
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/01/1987
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 04/09/1987
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 04/09/1987
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 04/09/1987
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 04/09/1987
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 04/09/1987
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 04/09/1987
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 04/09/1987
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 04/09/1987
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 04/09/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 04/09/1987
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/29/1987
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 04/29/1987
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 04/29/1987
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 04/29/1987
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 04/29/1987
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 04/29/1987
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 04/29/1987
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 04/29/1987
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 04/29/1987
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 04/29/1987
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/29/1987
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 04/29/1987
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14] 04/29/1987
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 04/29/1987
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 04/29/1987
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 04/29/1987
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 04/29/1987
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/29/1987
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 04/29/1987
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/29/1987
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/29/1987
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/29/1987
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/29/1987
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/29/1987
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 04/29/1987
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/29/1987
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 04/29/1987
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 04/29/1987
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7] 04/29/1987
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 04/29/1987
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 04/29/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 04/29/1987
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/29/1987
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 05/04/1987
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 05/04/1987
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 05/04/1987
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 05/04/1987
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/04/1987
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 05/04/1987
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/04/1987
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 05/04/1987
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 05/04/1987
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 05/06/1987
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 05/06/1987
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/06/1987
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/12/1987
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 05/12/1987
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 05/12/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 05/12/1987
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 05/12/1987
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 05/12/1987
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 05/12/1987
Rep. Sweeney, David McCann [R-TX-14] 05/12/1987
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 05/12/1987
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 05/12/1987
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/12/1987
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 05/12/1987
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 05/12/1987
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 05/12/1987
Rep. Konnyu, Ernest L. [R-CA-12] 05/21/1987
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 05/21/1987
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 05/21/1987
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 05/21/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 05/21/1987
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/21/1987
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 05/21/1987
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 05/21/1987
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/21/1987
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 05/21/1987
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 05/21/1987
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 05/21/1987
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 05/21/1987
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 05/21/1987
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 05/21/1987
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 05/21/1987
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 06/18/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/18/1987
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 06/18/1987
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/18/1987
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/16/1987
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 12/01/1987
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 12/03/1987

Show cosponsors who withdrew