Committees: H.R.1085 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services02/11/1987 Referred to
03/11/1987 Markup by
03/11/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-22 Part 2
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation02/23/1987 Referred to
03/05/1987 Markup by
03/05/1987 Reported by
House Veterans' Affairs02/11/1987 Referred to
03/04/1987 Markup by
03/11/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-22 Part 1
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment02/18/1987 Referred to
02/18/1987 Hearings by
02/26/1987 Markup by
02/26/1987 Reported by