Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9]* 02/24/1987
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 02/24/1987
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2]* 02/24/1987
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/05/1987
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 03/05/1987
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/05/1987
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 03/05/1987
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/05/1987
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 03/05/1987
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 03/05/1987
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/05/1987
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 03/05/1987
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/05/1987
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 03/05/1987
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/05/1987
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 03/05/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 03/05/1987
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 03/10/1987
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 03/10/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/10/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/10/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 03/30/1987
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 03/30/1987
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 03/30/1987
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/30/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 03/30/1987
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/30/1987
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 03/30/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/30/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/30/1987
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 03/30/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/30/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/30/1987
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/30/1987
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 03/30/1987
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 03/30/1987
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 03/30/1987
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/30/1987
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/30/1987
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/30/1987
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 03/30/1987
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 03/30/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/01/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/01/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/08/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 04/08/1987
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 04/08/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 04/08/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/08/1987
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 04/23/1987
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/23/1987
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/23/1987
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 05/20/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/20/1987
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/04/1987
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/08/1987
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 06/08/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/08/1987
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/08/1987
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 07/09/1987