Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Medicare Diabetic Foot Disease Prevention Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to allow Medicare payment for therapeutic shoes for individuals with severe diabetic foot disease.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/02/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
12/22/1987See H.R.3545.
03/10/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/05/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/02/1987Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/1987Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/02/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (83)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 03/02/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/09/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/09/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/09/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 04/09/1987
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/09/1987
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 04/09/1987
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 04/09/1987
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 04/09/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 04/09/1987
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 04/09/1987
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 04/09/1987
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 04/09/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/09/1987
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 04/09/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 04/09/1987
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 04/09/1987
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/02/1987
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/02/1987
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 06/02/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/02/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/02/1987
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/02/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 06/02/1987
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 06/02/1987
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 06/02/1987
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/02/1987
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 06/02/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/02/1987
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 06/02/1987
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 06/02/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 06/02/1987
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/02/1987
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/18/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 06/18/1987
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 06/18/1987
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 06/18/1987
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/18/1987
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 06/18/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 06/18/1987
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 12/08/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 12/08/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 12/08/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 12/08/1987
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 12/08/1987
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 12/08/1987
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 12/08/1987

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/02/1987 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment03/10/1987 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/02/1987 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health03/05/1987 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1325. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/02/1987)

Medicare Diabetic Foot Disease Prevention Act - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to provide coverage under part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance) of the Medicare program for therapeutic shoes furnished to individuals with severe diabetic foot disease.