Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Child Protection Act of 1987

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to protect the rights of victims of child abuse.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/05/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/26/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/05/1987Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 03/05/1987
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4]* 03/05/1987
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 03/12/1987
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 03/12/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/12/1987
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/08/1987
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/08/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 04/08/1987
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 04/08/1987
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 04/08/1987
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/08/1987
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 05/28/1987
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/28/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 05/28/1987
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 05/28/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/28/1987
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/28/1987
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/28/1987
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 05/28/1987
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/28/1987
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 07/15/1987
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 07/15/1987
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 07/15/1987
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 07/15/1987
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 07/15/1987
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 10/20/1987
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 10/29/1987
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 11/09/1987
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 12/08/1987
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 12/18/1987
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 01/25/1988
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/24/1988
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/28/1988
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 10/06/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/05/1987 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights05/26/1987 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1437.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1437. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/05/1987)

Child Protection Act of 1987 - Amends the Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations (RICO) Statute to extend its coverage to the sexual exploitation of children. Allows any person injured personally or in his business or property by such violations to bring a civil suit for treble damages.

Amends the Federal criminal code to require a mandatory life sentence in kidnapping offenses involving the murder of a minor. Establishes mandatory minimum sentences for the sexual exploitation of minors.

Provides that the period of any applicable limitation for the commencement of prosecution for certain offenses involving the sexual exploitation of children shall not begin until the child has reached the age of 18 years.

Directs the Attorney General to submit a report to the Congress detailing possible changes in the Federal Rules of Evidence, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, and other procedures which would facilitate the participation of child witnesses in cases involving child abuse and sexual exploitation.

Directs the Attorney General to modify the classification system used by the National Crime Information System and the Federal Bureau of Investigation with respect to offenses involving the sexual exploitation of children by: (1) including the age of the victim and the relationship of the victim to the offender; and (2) using a uniform definition of a child.