Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 03/05/1987
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4]* 03/05/1987
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/05/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 03/12/1987
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 03/12/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/12/1987
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/08/1987
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/08/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 04/08/1987
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 04/08/1987
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 04/08/1987
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/08/1987
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 05/28/1987
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/28/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 05/28/1987
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 05/28/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/28/1987
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 05/28/1987
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/28/1987
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 05/28/1987
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/28/1987
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 07/15/1987
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 07/15/1987
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 07/15/1987
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 07/15/1987
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 07/15/1987
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 10/20/1987
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 10/29/1987
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 11/09/1987
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 12/08/1987
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 12/18/1987
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 01/25/1988
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/24/1988
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/28/1988
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 10/06/1988