Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Public Rangelands Fee Act of 1987

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to establish grazing fees for domestic livestock on the public rangelands.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/09/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
09/22/1987Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
04/10/1987Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
03/09/1987Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2]* 03/09/1987
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 03/09/1987
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/09/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/09/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 03/09/1987
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/09/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 03/09/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 03/09/1987
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 03/30/1987
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/09/1987
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/23/1987
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 05/21/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 06/10/1987
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 06/23/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/16/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/23/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 10/14/1987
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/14/1987
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 10/14/1987
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 10/21/1987
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 10/21/1987
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 10/21/1987
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 10/21/1987
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/21/1987
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 11/09/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/09/1987
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 12/01/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 12/01/1987
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 12/10/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 12/10/1987
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 12/10/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 12/10/1987
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 12/10/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 12/16/1987
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 12/16/1987
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 12/16/1987
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 02/03/1988
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 02/03/1988
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 02/03/1988
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 02/03/1988
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/03/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/03/1988
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/17/1987 03/30/1987 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs03/09/1987 Referred to
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands04/10/1987 Referred to
09/22/1987 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1481.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1481. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/09/1987)

Public Rangelands Fee Act of 1987 - Sets forth a formula, beginning with grazing year 1987, for determining fees for domestic livestock grazing on public rangelands. Bases the formula on appraised base value, expressed in dollars per head or pair month, and the forage value index. Prohibits annual fee adjustments greater or less than 33.3 percent.