Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Great Smoky Mountains Wilderness Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Great Smoky Mountains Wilderness Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Great Smoky Mountains Wilderness Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Great Smoky Mountains Wilderness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to designate certain lands in Great Smoky Mountains National Park as wilderness, to provide for settlement of all claims of Swain County, North Carolina, against the United States under the agreement dated July 30, 1943, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
03/10/1988Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston under the authority of the order of Mar 4, 88 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 100-297. Minority views filed.
09/29/1987Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/29/1987Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-318.
03/10/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
06/23/1988SenateStar Print ordered Report 100-297.
06/21/1988SenateSecond cloture on the motion to proceed not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 54-42. Record Vote No: 195.
06/20/1988SenateFirst cloture on the motion to proceed not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49-35. Record Vote No: 192.
06/17/1988SenateSecond cloture motion on the motion to proceed presented in Senate.
06/17/1988SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate.
06/16/1988SenateMotion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate.
06/16/1988SenateCloture motion on the motion to proceed presented in Senate.
03/10/1988SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 580.
03/10/1988SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston under the authority of the order of Mar 4, 88 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 100-297. Minority views filed.
02/25/1988SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported in lieu of S. 693 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
10/23/1987SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, OMB, Tennessee Valley Authority.
10/01/1987SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
10/01/1987SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/29/1987HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/29/1987HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
09/29/1987HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 195.
09/29/1987HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-318.
07/29/1987HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
07/29/1987HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/29/1987HouseSubcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands Discharged.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
07/23/1987HouseExecutive Comment Received From Interior.
06/25/1987HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands
03/26/1987HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
03/18/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
03/10/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
03/10/1987HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 04/07/1987
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 04/07/1987
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/07/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 04/07/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/07/1987
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 04/07/1987
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/07/1987
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 04/07/1987
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/07/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/07/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/30/1987
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/30/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/30/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 04/30/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/30/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 04/30/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/30/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 04/30/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 04/30/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/30/1987
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 04/30/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 04/30/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/30/1987
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/30/1987
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 06/25/1987
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/25/1987
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 06/25/1987
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 06/25/1987
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 06/25/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/25/1987
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/25/1987
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/25/1987
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 09/16/1987
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 09/16/1987

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs03/10/1987 Referred to
07/29/1987 Markup by
09/29/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-318
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands03/18/1987 Referred to
06/25/1987 Hearings by
07/29/1987 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources10/01/1987 Referred to
02/25/1988 Markup by
03/10/1988 Reported by S.Rept 100-297
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests10/01/1987 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1495. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (03/10/1988)

(Reported to Senate from the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources with amendment, S. Rept. 100-297)

Great Smoky Mountains Wilderness Act - Designates specified lands in the Great Smoky Mountains National Park in North Carolina and Tennessee as the Great Smoky Mountains Wilderness. Sets forth requirements with respect to the management of the wilderness area, including rights and easements, cemeteries, and roads and trails. Provides that the designation of such area shall not affect motorized recreation or other activities on Fontana Reservoir. Authorizes the Tennessee Valley Authority to retain only those rights and easements in such area which are necessary for the operation and maintenance of the Fontana Reservoir and Dam and associated transmission lines which involve lands outside such area.

Provides for the settlement of all claims of Swain County, North Carolina, against the United States under the agreement of July 30, 1943, providing for construction of a road along the north shore of Fontana Reservoir.

Authorizes appropriations.