Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 04/07/1987
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 04/07/1987
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/07/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 04/07/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/07/1987
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 04/07/1987
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/07/1987
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 04/07/1987
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/07/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 04/07/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/30/1987
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/30/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/30/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 04/30/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/30/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 04/30/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 04/30/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 04/30/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 04/30/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/30/1987
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 04/30/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 04/30/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/30/1987
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/30/1987
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 06/25/1987
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 06/25/1987
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 06/25/1987
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 06/25/1987
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 06/25/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/25/1987
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/25/1987
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/25/1987
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 09/16/1987
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 09/16/1987