Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Patents in Space Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 35, United States Code, and the National Aeronautics and Space Act of 1958, with respect to the use of inventions in outer space.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
10/05/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/03/1988Reported to House by House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. Report No: 100-51 (Part II).
04/09/1987Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-51 (Part I).
03/10/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
10/06/1988SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
10/05/1988SenateReceived in the Senate.
10/05/1988HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/05/1988HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
10/03/1988HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 611.
10/03/1988HouseReported to House by House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. Report No: 100-51 (Part II).
10/03/1988HouseOrdered to be Reported.
10/03/1988HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/03/1988HouseSubcommittee on Space Science and Applications Discharged.
Action By: House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Space Science and Applications
04/09/1987HouseReported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-51 (Part I).
04/08/1987HouseOrdered to be Reported.
04/08/1987HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/01/1987HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice
04/01/1987HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice
03/26/1987HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice
03/12/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Space Science and Applications.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space and Technology
03/12/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/10/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
03/10/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
03/10/1987HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/10/1987 Referred to
04/08/1987 Markup by
04/09/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-51 Part 1
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice03/12/1987 Referred to
04/01/1987 Markup by
04/01/1987 Reported by
House Science, Space and Technology03/10/1987 Referred to
10/03/1988 Markup by
10/03/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-51 Part 2
House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Space Science and Applications03/12/1987 Referred to
10/03/1988 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary10/06/1988 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1510. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/05/1988)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Patents in Space Act - Amends the National Aeronautics and Space Act of 1958 and the Federal patent law to provide that any invention made, used, or sold in outer space on an aeronautical and space vehicle under the jurisdiction or control of the United States shall be considered made, used, or sold within the United States. Applies this provision to all patents granted before, on, or after the date of enactment of this Act, with certain exceptions.