Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 03/10/1987
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 03/10/1987
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 03/17/1987
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/17/1987
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/17/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 03/17/1987
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/09/1987
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 04/09/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/09/1987
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 05/19/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 05/19/1987
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 06/10/1987
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/10/1987
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 06/10/1987
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 07/08/1987
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 07/08/1987
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 10/06/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/20/1987
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 10/20/1987
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 10/20/1987
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 10/20/1987
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 10/20/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 10/20/1987
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 10/20/1987
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 11/05/1987
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 11/05/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 11/05/1987
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 11/05/1987
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 11/05/1987
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 11/17/1987
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 11/17/1987
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 11/17/1987
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 12/02/1987
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 12/18/1987
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 12/18/1987
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 01/25/1988
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 01/25/1988
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 01/25/1988
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 02/03/1988
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 02/03/1988
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/25/1988
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 03/03/1988
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 03/03/1988
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/16/1988
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 03/16/1988
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/16/1988
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/16/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 04/19/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/19/1988
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 04/19/1988
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 04/19/1988
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 04/19/1988
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 04/19/1988
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/27/1988
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 04/27/1988
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 04/27/1988
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 04/27/1988
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 06/14/1988
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 06/14/1988
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 06/14/1988
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/14/1988
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 06/14/1988
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/22/1988