Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 01/06/1987
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 01/20/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 01/20/1987
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 01/20/1987
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/20/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 01/20/1987
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 01/20/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 01/20/1987
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/20/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 01/20/1987
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 01/20/1987
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 01/20/1987
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 01/20/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 01/20/1987
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 01/20/1987
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 01/20/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 01/20/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 01/20/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 01/20/1987
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 01/20/1987
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 01/27/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 01/27/1987
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/27/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 01/27/1987
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 01/27/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/27/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 01/27/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/27/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 01/27/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 01/27/1987
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 01/27/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/04/1987
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 02/04/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/04/1987
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/04/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 02/04/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/04/1987
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 02/04/1987
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 02/04/1987
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/04/1987
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 02/10/1987
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 02/10/1987
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 02/10/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/10/1987
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/10/1987
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 02/10/1987
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 02/10/1987
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/10/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 02/10/1987
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 02/10/1987
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 02/10/1987
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/24/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/24/1987
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 02/24/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 02/24/1987
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 02/24/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 02/24/1987
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 02/24/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/04/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 03/04/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 03/04/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/04/1987
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 03/04/1987
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/04/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/04/1987
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 03/04/1987
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 03/04/1987
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/04/1987
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 03/04/1987
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 03/04/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 03/11/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/11/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 03/11/1987
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 03/11/1987
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 03/11/1987
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 03/19/1987
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 03/19/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 03/19/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 03/19/1987
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 03/19/1987
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 03/19/1987
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 03/19/1987
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 03/19/1987
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 03/19/1987
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 03/19/1987
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/07/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/07/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/07/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 04/07/1987
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 04/07/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/07/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 04/07/1987
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 04/28/1987
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 04/28/1987
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/28/1987
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/28/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 04/28/1987
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/28/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 04/28/1987
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 04/28/1987
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 05/12/1987
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/12/1987
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 05/12/1987
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/12/1987
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 05/12/1987
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 05/12/1987
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 05/28/1987
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 05/28/1987
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 05/28/1987
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/28/1987
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/24/1987