Committees: H.R.1720 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor03/19/1987 Referred to
05/05/1987 Hearings by
07/15/1987 Markup by
08/07/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-159 Part 2
House Energy and Commerce03/19/1987 Referred to
07/21/1987 Markup by
09/15/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-159 Part 3
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment03/30/1987 Referred to
04/24/1987 Hearings by
07/01/1987 Markup by
07/01/1987 Reported by
House Ways and Means03/19/1987 Referred to
06/10/1987 Markup by
06/17/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-159 Part 1
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Public Assistance and Unemployment Compensation03/26/1987 Referred to
04/01/1987 Hearings by
04/09/1987 Markup by
04/09/1987 Reported by
Senate Finance12/17/1987 Referred to
04/20/1988 Markup by
06/07/1988 Reported by