Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Security Notch Act of 1987

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title II of the Social Security Act to provide for an improved benefit computation formula for workers who attain age 65 in or after 1982 and to whom applies the 5-year period of transition to the changes in benefit computation rules enacted in the Social Security Amendments of 1977 (and related beneficiaries) and to provide prospectively for increases in their benefits accordingly.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/19/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/24/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/19/1987Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 03/19/1987
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 03/19/1987
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/06/1987
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/06/1987
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/02/1987
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 06/02/1987
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 09/10/1987
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 09/25/1987
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/07/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 10/07/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 10/07/1987
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 10/15/1987
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 10/19/1987
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 11/10/1987
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/25/1988
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/16/1988
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 02/16/1988
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 02/29/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/16/1988
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 04/26/1988
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/17/1988
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 05/23/1988
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/09/1988
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/13/1988
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/27/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/19/1987 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security03/24/1987 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (2)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1721. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/19/1987)

Social Security Notch Act of 1987 - Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act to alter the formula for computing the primary insurance amount of individuals who attain age 65 in or after 1982 and are subject to the benefit computation rules of the Social Security Amendments of 1977.