Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 04/01/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/06/1987
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 05/19/1987
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 05/19/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 05/19/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/19/1987
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 05/28/1987
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 05/28/1987
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/28/1987
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 05/28/1987
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 06/10/1987
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large] 06/10/1987
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 06/10/1987
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 06/10/1987
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/10/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/10/1987
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/10/1987
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 06/16/1987
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/16/1987
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 06/16/1987
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/16/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/16/1987
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 06/16/1987
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 06/22/1987
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 06/22/1987
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 06/22/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/25/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/25/1987
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 06/25/1987
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 06/25/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/25/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 06/25/1987
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/26/1987
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 06/26/1987
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/07/1987
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/07/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/07/1987
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 07/07/1987
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/07/1987
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/14/1987
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 07/27/1987
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/27/1987
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 08/03/1987
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 08/07/1987
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/15/1987
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 10/27/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/02/1988
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/1988
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 04/20/1988
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 04/20/1988
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/26/1988