Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 03/24/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 04/01/1987
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 04/01/1987
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 04/01/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 04/01/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/01/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/01/1987
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/09/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/09/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/09/1987
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/09/1987
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/09/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/09/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/09/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/09/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/08/1987
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 12/08/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/17/1988
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 05/26/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/26/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/13/1988
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/13/1988
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/29/1988
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 06/29/1988
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 06/29/1988