Committees: H.R.1807 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Small Business03/25/1987 Referred to
09/29/1987 Hearings by
11/09/1987 Markup by
11/25/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-460
House Small Business Subcommittee on Procurement, Innovation and Minority Enterprise Development04/23/1987 Referred to
05/12/1987 Hearings by
05/18/1987 Hearings by
05/19/1987 Hearings by
05/20/1987 Hearings by
05/21/1987 Hearings by
06/04/1987 Hearings by
07/28/1987 Markup by
07/28/1987 Reported by
Senate Small Business12/04/1987 Referred to
02/02/1988 Hearings by
02/18/1988 Hearings by
02/25/1988 Hearings by
05/17/1988 Markup by
06/22/1988 Reported by