Committees: H.R.1811 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/25/1987 Referred to
07/22/1987 Markup by
07/23/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-235
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Compensation, Pension and Insurance05/20/1987 Referred to
05/20/1987 Hearings by
06/17/1987 Markup by
06/17/1987 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/29/1987 Referred to
04/14/1988 Discharged from