Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 04/09/1987
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 04/29/1987
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/29/1987
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 04/29/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/29/1987
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 04/29/1987
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/29/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 04/29/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 04/29/1987
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 04/29/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 05/08/1987
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 05/08/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 05/08/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/08/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/08/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/08/1987
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/08/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/08/1987
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 05/21/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/21/1987
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 05/21/1987
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 05/21/1987
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/10/1987
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 06/10/1987
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 06/10/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/10/1987
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/10/1987
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 06/23/1987
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/23/1987
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 06/23/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/23/1987
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/01/1987
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/05/1987
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 09/22/1987
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 09/22/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 10/20/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 10/20/1987
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 10/20/1987
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/20/1987
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 10/29/1987
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 10/29/1987
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/29/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 11/17/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 11/17/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 12/02/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/02/1987
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 12/02/1987
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 12/21/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 03/31/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 03/31/1988
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/25/1988