Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend section 1105 of title 31, United States Code, relating to the President's budget to require it to separately set forth the annual budget of the Federal Reserve System.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/09/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/20/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
Action By: Committee on Government Operations
04/09/1987Referred to House Committee on Government Operations.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/09/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 04/09/1987
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 05/11/1987
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 05/11/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/11/1987
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 05/11/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/11/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/11/1987
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 05/11/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/19/1987
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/19/1987
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 06/03/1987
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 06/03/1987
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/13/1987
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/03/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Operations04/09/1987 Referred to
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security04/20/1987 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2057.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2057. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/09/1987)

Requires the President to include with the annual Federal budget submitted to the Congress another budget prepared by the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System showing estimated receipts and expenditures for itself and all Federal Reserve banks for the next three fiscal years.