Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/06/1987
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/06/1987
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 05/13/1987
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 05/19/1987
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/19/1987
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 05/19/1987
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/19/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 05/20/1987
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 05/20/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/20/1987
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 05/20/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/20/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/20/1987
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/21/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/27/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 05/27/1987
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 05/27/1987
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/27/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/27/1987
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/27/1987
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 06/03/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/03/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 06/03/1987
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/03/1987
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 06/03/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/03/1987
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/03/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/03/1987
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 06/08/1987
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 06/08/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/08/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/08/1987
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 06/08/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 06/08/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/17/1987
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 06/17/1987
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/17/1987
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/23/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 06/23/1987
Rep. Grant, Bill [D-FL-2] 06/23/1987
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 06/23/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/23/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/08/1987
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/08/1987
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/08/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/08/1987
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 07/08/1987
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/08/1987
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 07/08/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 07/22/1987
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/22/1987
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 07/22/1987
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 07/22/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 07/29/1987
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 07/29/1987
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 08/04/1987
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 08/04/1987
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 08/07/1987
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 09/09/1987
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/09/1987
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 09/09/1987
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 10/01/1987
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 10/01/1987
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/01/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/01/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 10/01/1987
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 10/01/1987
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/21/1987
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 10/21/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/21/1987
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 10/21/1987
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 10/21/1987
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 10/21/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 10/27/1987
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 10/27/1987
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 10/27/1987
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 10/27/1987
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/04/1987
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 11/04/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 11/04/1987
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 11/04/1987
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 11/04/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 11/04/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 11/04/1987
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-23] 11/04/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/04/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 11/04/1987
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/17/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 11/17/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 11/17/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 11/17/1987
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 11/17/1987
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 11/17/1987
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/17/1987
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 11/17/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 11/17/1987
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 11/17/1987
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 11/17/1987
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 11/17/1987
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 11/17/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 12/02/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 12/02/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 12/02/1987
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 12/02/1987
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 12/16/1987
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 12/16/1987
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 12/16/1987
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 03/02/1988
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 03/02/1988
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 03/02/1988
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 03/02/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/02/1988
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/02/1988
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 03/02/1988
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 04/13/1988
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 04/25/1988
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 04/25/1988
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/25/1988
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 04/25/1988
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 04/25/1988
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 05/10/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 05/10/1988
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 05/10/1988
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 05/10/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/10/1988
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/10/1988
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/10/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 05/10/1988
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/10/1988
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 05/10/1988
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/10/1988
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 05/10/1988
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/10/1988
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 05/10/1988
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 05/10/1988
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 05/10/1988
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/10/1988
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 05/10/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/10/1988
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/10/1988
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/19/1988
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/19/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 05/19/1988
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 05/19/1988
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/19/1988
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 05/19/1988
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 05/19/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/19/1988
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 05/19/1988
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 05/19/1988
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/19/1988
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 05/19/1988
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/19/1988
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 06/29/1988
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 06/29/1988
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 07/26/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 08/08/1988
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 08/09/1988
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 08/09/1988
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 09/07/1988
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 09/07/1988
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 09/27/1988
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/21/1988

Show cosponsors who withdrew