Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 04/23/1987
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 04/23/1987
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 04/23/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/02/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/02/1987
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 06/02/1987
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/17/1987
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 06/17/1987
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/17/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/17/1987
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 06/17/1987
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 06/17/1987
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/17/1987
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 06/17/1987
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 06/17/1987
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 06/18/1987
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/18/1987
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 06/18/1987
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 06/18/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 08/04/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 08/04/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 08/04/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 08/04/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 08/04/1987
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 08/04/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/20/1987
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/20/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 10/20/1987