Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 05/27/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/27/1987
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/27/1987
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/27/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/27/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/27/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 05/27/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 05/27/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 05/27/1987
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 05/27/1987
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 05/27/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/27/1987
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/27/1987
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/27/1987
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 05/27/1987
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/27/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/27/1987
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/27/1987
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 06/16/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/16/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 06/16/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 06/16/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 06/16/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/16/1987
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/16/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/16/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/16/1987
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 07/07/1987
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 07/07/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 07/07/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 07/07/1987
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 09/15/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 09/15/1987
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 09/15/1987
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/15/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 09/15/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 09/15/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/15/1987
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 02/17/1988
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/17/1988
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 02/17/1988
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 02/17/1988
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 02/17/1988
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 03/09/1988
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 03/09/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 03/09/1988
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/09/1988
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 03/09/1988
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/09/1988
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 03/09/1988
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/09/1988
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/11/1988
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/11/1988
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 05/10/1988
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/10/1988
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 08/01/1988
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 08/03/1988