Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 05/05/1987
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/05/1987
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 05/05/1987
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/07/1987
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 05/07/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/07/1987
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/07/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 05/07/1987
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/07/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/07/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 05/07/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/07/1987
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/07/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/13/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 05/13/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/13/1987
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 05/13/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 05/13/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 05/13/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/13/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 05/13/1987
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/13/1987
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 05/13/1987
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 05/13/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 05/21/1987
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 05/21/1987
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/21/1987
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/21/1987
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 05/21/1987
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 05/21/1987
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/21/1987
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/21/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 05/21/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/21/1987
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 05/21/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/21/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 05/21/1987
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 05/21/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 05/21/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 05/21/1987
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/21/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 05/21/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/21/1987
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 05/27/1987
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/27/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/27/1987
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 05/27/1987
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 05/27/1987
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/27/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 05/27/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 05/27/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/27/1987
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 05/27/1987
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 05/27/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/28/1987
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 05/28/1987
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 05/28/1987
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/28/1987
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/28/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/28/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/28/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/04/1987
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/04/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/04/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 06/04/1987
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 06/04/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/04/1987
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 06/04/1987
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/04/1987
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 06/11/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 06/11/1987
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/11/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/11/1987
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 06/16/1987
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/16/1987
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/16/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 06/16/1987
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 06/16/1987
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 06/16/1987
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/18/1987
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/23/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 06/29/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/29/1987
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/08/1987