Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 04/30/1987
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 04/30/1987
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 05/06/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 05/06/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 05/06/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 05/06/1987
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 05/06/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 05/06/1987
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 05/07/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 05/07/1987
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20] 05/12/1987
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 05/12/1987
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 05/12/1987
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 05/12/1987
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14] 05/12/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/12/1987
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/13/1987
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 05/13/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 05/19/1987
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/19/1987
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 05/19/1987
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/19/1987
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/19/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 05/19/1987
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/19/1987
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/19/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/19/1987
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 05/19/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 05/28/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/28/1987
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 05/28/1987
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 06/04/1987
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/04/1987
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/04/1987
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/04/1987
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 06/04/1987
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/04/1987
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/24/1987
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 06/24/1987
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 06/24/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/01/1987
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 07/01/1987
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 07/01/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 07/01/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 07/01/1987
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 07/01/1987
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/01/1987
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 07/13/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 07/13/1987
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 07/13/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 07/13/1987
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 07/13/1987
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 07/13/1987
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 07/22/1987
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 07/22/1987
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/22/1987
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/22/1987
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/22/1987
Rep. Boulter, Beau [R-TX-13] 07/29/1987
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 07/29/1987
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/29/1987
Rep. Swindall, Patrick L. [R-GA-4] 07/29/1987
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/29/1987
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 08/03/1987
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 08/03/1987
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 08/03/1987
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 08/03/1987
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 08/03/1987
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 08/03/1987
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 08/03/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 08/03/1987
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 08/03/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 08/03/1987
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 08/07/1987
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 08/07/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/07/1987
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 08/07/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 08/07/1987
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31] 08/07/1987
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 08/07/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 08/07/1987
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 08/07/1987
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 08/07/1987
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 08/07/1987
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 09/16/1987
Rep. Grant, Bill [D-FL-2] 09/16/1987
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/16/1987
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/16/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/16/1987
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/16/1987
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 09/16/1987
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/16/1987
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 09/16/1987
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 09/16/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/16/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 09/16/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 09/16/1987
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 09/16/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/16/1987
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 09/16/1987
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-8] 09/16/1987
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 10/01/1987
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 10/01/1987
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 10/01/1987
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 10/01/1987
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/01/1987
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/21/1987
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/21/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/21/1987
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 10/21/1987
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 11/04/1987
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 11/04/1987
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 11/04/1987
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 11/04/1987
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 11/04/1987
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 11/04/1987
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 11/04/1987
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 11/04/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/17/1987
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 11/17/1987
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 11/17/1987
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 11/17/1987
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 11/17/1987
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 11/17/1987
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 11/18/1987
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 12/03/1987
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 12/11/1987
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 12/11/1987
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 12/18/1987
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 12/18/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 01/27/1988
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 01/27/1988
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 01/27/1988
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 02/03/1988
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 02/17/1988
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 02/17/1988
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 02/17/1988
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 02/17/1988
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 03/17/1988
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 03/17/1988
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 03/17/1988
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 03/17/1988
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/22/1988
Rep. Konnyu, Ernest L. [R-CA-12] 03/31/1988
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 03/31/1988
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 04/19/1988
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 04/19/1988
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 04/19/1988
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/01/1988

Show cosponsors who withdrew