Committees: H.R.242 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interior and Insular Affairs01/06/1987 Referred to
03/04/1987 Markup by
03/05/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-15
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands02/05/1987 Referred to
02/24/1987 Markup by
02/24/1987 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/11/1987 Referred to
09/16/1987 Markup by
09/25/1987 Reported by S.Rept 100-178
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks and Forests03/11/1987 Referred to
07/30/1987 Hearings by