Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for medicare coverage of annual pap smears and mammograms.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/20/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
11/03/1987Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health
05/28/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/26/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/20/1987Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/20/1987Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/20/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 06/09/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 06/09/1987
Rep. Konnyu, Ernest L. [R-CA-12]* 06/09/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 06/09/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 06/09/1987
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 06/10/1987
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/10/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/10/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/10/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 06/10/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 06/10/1987
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/10/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/11/1987
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 06/11/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/11/1987
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 06/16/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 06/16/1987
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/16/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 06/16/1987
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 06/16/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 06/16/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 06/16/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/16/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 06/16/1987
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 06/17/1987
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 06/17/1987
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 06/23/1987
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 06/23/1987
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/23/1987
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/23/1987
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 06/23/1987
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 06/23/1987
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 06/23/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/23/1987
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 06/26/1987
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 06/26/1987
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/26/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/26/1987
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 06/26/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 06/26/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/26/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/26/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/01/1987
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 07/01/1987
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 07/01/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 07/01/1987
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 07/01/1987
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/01/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 07/01/1987
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 07/01/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/09/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 07/14/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/14/1987
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/22/1987
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 07/22/1987
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 07/22/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 07/29/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 08/04/1987
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/1987
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/14/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/14/1987
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 10/07/1987
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 11/09/1987
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 06/09/1987 06/25/1987 --

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/20/1987 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment05/28/1987 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/20/1987 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health05/26/1987 Referred to
11/03/1987 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2482.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2482. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/20/1987)

Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to cover an annual Papanicolaou test for the diagnosis of uterine cancer and an annual radiological mammogram for the diagnosis of breast cancer.