Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Employees Leave Act of 1987

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 5, United States Code, to provide for the establishment of a voluntary leave transfer program for Federal employees, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/20/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
10/01/1987Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From US Postal Service.
08/04/1987Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits
05/28/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
05/28/1987Executive Comment Requested from OMB, OPM.
05/20/1987Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/20/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (102)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 05/20/1987
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 05/20/1987
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/20/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/15/1987
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 07/15/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 07/15/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 07/15/1987
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 07/15/1987
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 07/15/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 07/15/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 07/15/1987
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 07/15/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/15/1987
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/15/1987
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 07/15/1987
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/15/1987
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/15/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/15/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 07/15/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/15/1987
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 07/15/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/15/1987
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 07/15/1987
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 07/15/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/15/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 07/15/1987
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 07/15/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 07/15/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/15/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 07/15/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 07/15/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 07/15/1987
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 07/15/1987
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/15/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 07/15/1987
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 07/15/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 07/15/1987
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 07/15/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 07/15/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/15/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 07/15/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 07/15/1987
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 07/15/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/15/1987
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/15/1987
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 07/15/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/15/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 08/03/1987
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 08/03/1987
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 08/03/1987
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 08/03/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 08/03/1987
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 08/03/1987
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 08/03/1987
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 08/03/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/03/1987
Rep. Saiki, Patricia [R-HI-1] 08/03/1987
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 08/03/1987
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 08/03/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 08/03/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 09/16/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 09/16/1987
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/16/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/16/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/16/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 09/16/1987
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 09/16/1987
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 09/16/1987
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 09/16/1987
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 12/11/1987
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 12/11/1987
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 12/11/1987
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 12/11/1987
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 12/11/1987
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 12/11/1987
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 12/11/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 12/16/1987
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/16/1987
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 02/16/1988
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 02/16/1988
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 02/16/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service05/20/1987 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits05/28/1987 Referred to
08/04/1987 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2487. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/20/1987)

Federal Employees Leave Act of 1987 - Directs the Office of Personnel Management to establish a program under which the annual leave of a Federal employee may be transferred to the annual leave of any other Federal employee if such other employee requires additional leave because of a personal emergency.

Describes the requirements for receiving and using transferred leave and for donating annual leave.

Requires agencies to establish procedures to ensure that a leave recipient is not permitted to use or receive transferred leave after the personal emergency ceases to exist.

Provides for restoring unused transferred leave to leave donors on a prorated basis.

Prohibits an employee from being coerced into donating, receiving, or using annual leave under the voluntary leave transfer program.

Makes postal employees eligible to participate in such program.

Authorizes the exclusion from such program of employees working under negotiated contracts and agencies for which such program would cause substantial disruption.

Requires such program to terminate five years after its commencement. Requires the Office of Personnel Management to report to the President and the Congress on the program not later than six months before its termination.

Authorizes the Office to establish general guidelines for agencies to conduct experimental programs to determine the desirability and feasibility of providing additional leave as a means of recognizing outstanding performance or other achievements by Federal employees. Terminates such experimental programs five years after the date of enactment of this Act. Requires the Office to report to the President and the Congress on such programs not later than six months after their termination.