Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Separation of Powers Act of 1987

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to repeal certain provisions of law which violate the doctrine of separation of powers and to eliminate certain restrictions on the authority of the executive branch.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/27/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date All Actions
06/09/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
06/08/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/08/1987Referred to Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/08/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/01/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Economic Stabilization.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
05/29/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Energy Research and Development.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space and Technology
05/29/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Investigations.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/29/1987Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
05/27/1987Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/27/1987Referred to House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/27/1987Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/27/1987Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/27/1987Referred to House Committee on Banking, Finance and Urban Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/27/1987Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/27/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services05/27/1987 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Investigations05/29/1987 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs05/27/1987 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Stabilization06/01/1987 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs05/27/1987 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science06/08/1987 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade06/08/1987 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations06/08/1987 Referred to
House Interior and Insular Affairs05/27/1987 Referred to
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment06/09/1987 Referred to
House Science, Space and Technology05/27/1987 Referred to
House Science, Space and Technology Subcommittee on Energy Research and Development05/29/1987 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs05/27/1987 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2520.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2520. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/27/1987)

Separation of Powers Act of 1987 - Repeals the War Powers Resolution.

Deletes the provision contained in the law providing for an early warning system in Sinai that permits the Congress to require the removal of U.S. civilian personnel assigned to Sinai if the Congress by concurrent resolution determines that the safety of such personnel is jeopardized or that continuation of their role is no longer necessary.

Amends the International Emergency Economic Powers Act to repeal the authority of the Congress to terminate a declaration of a national emergency by concurrent resolution.

Amends the Neutrality Act of 1939 to repeal the provision that authorizes the Congress by concurrent resolution to declare that a state of war exists between foreign states.

Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to delete certain provisions that give the Congress the authority to limit certain international aid programs, including nuclear transfers, by adopting a concurrent resolution. Deletes the provision prohibiting the use of foreign aid funds to train the police forces of foreign countries.

Changes certain provisions relating to the Department of Defense that give the Congress the authority to limit actions of the Department of Defense by adopting a resolution or a concurrent resolution or by requiring the Department of Defense to notify the Congress before taking action (including provisions dealing with the ordering to duty of selected reserves, emergency construction projects, contributions for NATO infrastructure, Naval Petroleum Reserves, and a long-range proving ground for guided missiles).

Amends certain Acts dealing with armed forces personnel and veterans' health care to limit the authority of the Congress to oversee programs contained in such Act.

Amends the Federal Nonnuclear Energy Research and Development Act of 1974 to delete the provision authorizing the Congress to nullify a proposed rule or order by passage of a resolution.

Amends the Atomic Energy Act of 1954 and the Nuclear Non-Proliferation Act of 1978 to delete certain provisions that give the Congress the authority to oversee actions, programs, or agreements under such Acts.