Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to require a report on security arrangements in the Persian Gulf.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/02/1987Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 302 - 105 (Record Vote No: 160).
05/28/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
06/11/1987SenateCommittee on Armed Services. Hearings held.
06/05/1987SenateCommittee on Armed Services requested executive comment from Defense Department.
06/03/1987SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
06/02/1987HousePassed House by Yea-Nay Vote: 302 - 105 (Record Vote No: 160).
06/02/1987HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
06/02/1987HouseTabled by Committee.
06/02/1987HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/01/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Investigations.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/01/1987HouseExecutive Comment Requested from DOD.
05/28/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
05/28/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Armed Services.
05/28/1987HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 05/28/1987

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services05/28/1987 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Investigations06/01/1987 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs05/28/1987 Referred to
06/02/1987 Markup by
Senate Armed Services06/03/1987 Referred to
06/11/1987 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2533.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2533. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/28/1987)

Directs the Secretary of Defense to submit a report to the Congress on the security needs of U.S. forces in the Persian Gulf region.