Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 06/04/1987
Rep. DioGuardi, Joseph J. [R-NY-20]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 06/04/1987
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7]* 06/04/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 06/16/1987
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 06/16/1987
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 06/16/1987
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 06/16/1987
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 06/16/1987
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 06/16/1987
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/16/1987
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 06/16/1987
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 06/23/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 06/23/1987
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/23/1987
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 06/23/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 06/23/1987
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/23/1987
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 06/23/1987
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 07/07/1987
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 07/07/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 07/07/1987
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/07/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/07/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 07/07/1987
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 07/07/1987
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 07/07/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 07/07/1987
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-12] 07/21/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/21/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 07/21/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 07/21/1987
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 07/21/1987
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 07/21/1987
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 07/21/1987
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 07/21/1987
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/21/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 07/21/1987
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 08/03/1987
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 08/03/1987
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 08/03/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 08/03/1987
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 08/03/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 09/09/1987
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 09/09/1987
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 09/09/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 09/09/1987
Rep. Slaughter, D. French, Jr. [R-VA-7] 09/09/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 09/09/1987
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 09/09/1987
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 09/09/1987
Rep. Grant, Bill [D-FL-2] 09/09/1987
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/09/1987
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/17/1987
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/17/1987
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 09/17/1987
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 09/17/1987
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 09/17/1987
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 09/17/1987
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/17/1987
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 09/17/1987
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 09/17/1987
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 10/14/1987
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 10/14/1987
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/14/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 10/14/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 10/14/1987
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 10/14/1987
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/14/1987
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 10/14/1987
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 11/10/1987
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 11/10/1987
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 11/10/1987
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 11/10/1987
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 11/10/1987
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 01/27/1988
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 01/27/1988
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/27/1988
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 01/27/1988
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 02/23/1988
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 02/23/1988
Rep. Rostenkowski, Dan [D-IL-8] 04/28/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/28/1988
Rep. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL-13] 04/28/1988
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 04/28/1988
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 04/28/1988
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 04/28/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/28/1988
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 04/28/1988
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 04/28/1988
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 04/28/1988