Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to provide that a certain amount of funds shall be available to the Secretary of Energy each fiscal year for cleanup of hazardous or radioactive waste from atomic energy defense activities and to require the Secretary of Energy to develop within one year a comprehensive plan for the cleanup of such waste.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/08/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/11/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Procurement and Military Nuclear Systems.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/11/1987Executive Comment Requested from DOE.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/08/1987Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 06/10/1987
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 06/10/1987
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5]* 06/10/1987
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 06/15/1987
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/13/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 03/17/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services06/08/1987 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Procurement and Military Nuclear Systems06/11/1987 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2625.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2625. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/1987)

Makes funds available to the Secretary of Energy, according to a specified formula, for the cleanup of hazardous or radioactive waste from atomic energy defense activities. Directs the Secretary of Defense to transfer to the Secretary of Energy the amount calculated according to such formula. Precludes the use of such funds for repository costs resulting from permanent disposal of high-level radioactive waste from atomic energy defense activities. Makes such funds available for FY 1988 through 1992.

Requires the Secretary of Energy, in conjunction with the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency, to: (1) develop a comprehensive plan, including a timetable and estimated costs, for the cleanup of hazardous or radioactive waste from atomic energy defense activities; and (2) submit such plan to specified congressional committees.