Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-31]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Cheney, Dick [R-WY-At Large]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/11/1987
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Sweeney, David McCann [R-TX-14]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 06/11/1987
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/23/1987
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 06/24/1987
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 06/29/1987
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 06/30/1987
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 06/30/1987
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 06/30/1987
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 07/14/1987
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 07/14/1987
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 07/14/1987
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/14/1987
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/20/1987
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 07/23/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 07/23/1987
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/29/1987