Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5]* 06/16/1987
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 06/16/1987
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 06/16/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/26/1987
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 06/26/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 06/26/1987
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 06/26/1987
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 06/26/1987
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/26/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/26/1987
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 06/26/1987
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/26/1987
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 06/26/1987
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 06/26/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/26/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/26/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 06/26/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 06/26/1987
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/26/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 06/26/1987
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 06/26/1987
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 06/30/1987
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/30/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 06/30/1987
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/30/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/30/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/30/1987
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-5] 06/30/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/30/1987
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/30/1987
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/30/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/30/1987
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 06/30/1987
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 06/30/1987
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/30/1987
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 06/30/1987
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 06/30/1987
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 06/30/1987
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 06/30/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 06/30/1987
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/30/1987
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/30/1987
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 06/30/1987
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 06/30/1987
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 06/30/1987
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 06/30/1987
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 06/30/1987
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 06/30/1987
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/30/1987
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 06/30/1987
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 06/30/1987
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 06/30/1987
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 07/08/1987
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 07/08/1987
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 07/08/1987
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/08/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/08/1987
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/08/1987
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 07/08/1987
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/08/1987
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 07/08/1987
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 07/08/1987
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 07/08/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 07/08/1987
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 07/08/1987
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15] 07/08/1987
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/08/1987
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 07/08/1987
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 07/08/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/08/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/08/1987
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 07/08/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/08/1987
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/08/1987
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 07/08/1987
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 07/08/1987
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 07/08/1987
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 07/08/1987
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 07/14/1987
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/14/1987
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 07/14/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/14/1987
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11] 07/14/1987
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 07/14/1987
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/22/1987
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 07/22/1987
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 07/22/1987
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 07/22/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/22/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/22/1987
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 07/22/1987
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 07/22/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 07/22/1987
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 07/22/1987
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 07/29/1987
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 07/29/1987
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 07/29/1987
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/29/1987
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 07/29/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 08/06/1987
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 08/06/1987
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 08/06/1987
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 08/06/1987
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 08/06/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 09/10/1987
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 09/10/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/10/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 09/29/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 09/29/1987
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 09/29/1987
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 09/29/1987
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/29/1987
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 09/29/1987
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/29/1987
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 09/29/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 10/15/1987
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 10/15/1987
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 10/20/1987
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 10/26/1987
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 11/19/1987
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 12/02/1987
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 08/08/1988