Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-15]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 07/14/1987
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 07/14/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 07/14/1987
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 07/14/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/14/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 07/22/1987
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/22/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 07/29/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 07/29/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/29/1987
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 07/29/1987
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 08/05/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 08/05/1987
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 08/07/1987
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 08/07/1987
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 08/07/1987
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 08/07/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/07/1987
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 08/07/1987
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 08/07/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 08/07/1987
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 08/07/1987
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18] 08/07/1987
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 08/07/1987
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/14/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 09/14/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 09/14/1987
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 09/14/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/14/1987
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/14/1987
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/14/1987
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/14/1987
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 09/14/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 09/14/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/14/1987
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 09/14/1987
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 10/01/1987
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 10/01/1987
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 10/01/1987
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 10/01/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 10/01/1987
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/01/1987
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 10/01/1987
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 10/19/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 10/19/1987