Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22]* 07/01/1987
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 07/01/1987
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 07/14/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 07/14/1987
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 07/14/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 07/14/1987
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/14/1987
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/14/1987
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/14/1987
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 07/14/1987
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 07/14/1987
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 07/20/1987
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 07/20/1987
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 07/20/1987
Rep. Grant, Bill [D-FL-2] 07/20/1987
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 07/20/1987
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 07/20/1987
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 07/20/1987
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 07/20/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 07/20/1987
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 07/20/1987
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 07/20/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 07/20/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 07/20/1987
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 07/27/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 07/27/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/27/1987
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 07/27/1987
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 07/27/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 07/27/1987
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 07/27/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 07/27/1987
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 07/27/1987
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 07/27/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/27/1987
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 07/27/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/27/1987
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 07/27/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/28/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/28/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 07/28/1987
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 07/28/1987
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 07/28/1987
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 07/28/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 07/28/1987
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 07/28/1987
Rep. Davis, Jack [R-IL-4] 07/28/1987
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 07/29/1987
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 07/29/1987
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 08/03/1987
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 08/03/1987
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 08/03/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 08/03/1987
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 08/03/1987
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 08/03/1987
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 08/04/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 08/04/1987