Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 07/23/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 08/04/1987
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 08/04/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 09/15/1987
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 09/15/1987
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 09/29/1987
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 10/29/1987
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 02/16/1988
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 03/17/1988
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/29/1988
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 03/29/1988
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/18/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/18/1988
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/18/1988
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 04/18/1988
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/18/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 04/18/1988
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/02/1988
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 05/02/1988
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/02/1988
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/02/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 05/02/1988
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 05/02/1988
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 05/02/1988
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 05/02/1988
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 05/02/1988
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 05/02/1988
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 05/02/1988
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/02/1988
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 05/02/1988
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/02/1988
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/02/1988
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 05/17/1988
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 05/17/1988
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 05/17/1988
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 05/17/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 05/17/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/17/1988
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 05/17/1988
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/17/1988
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/17/1988
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/25/1988
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/25/1988
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 05/25/1988
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 05/25/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/25/1988
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/25/1988
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/25/1988
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/25/1988
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 06/01/1988
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 06/01/1988
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/01/1988
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/01/1988
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 06/01/1988
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/01/1988
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 06/01/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/10/1988
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 06/10/1988
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 06/10/1988
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3] 06/10/1988
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 06/10/1988
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 06/10/1988
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 06/10/1988
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/10/1988
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/23/1988
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/23/1988
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 06/23/1988
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 06/23/1988
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 06/23/1988
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/23/1988
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/12/1988
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 07/12/1988
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 07/12/1988
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 07/12/1988
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 07/12/1988
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 07/12/1988
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 07/12/1988
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/12/1988
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 07/12/1988
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 07/28/1988
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 07/28/1988
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 07/28/1988
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 07/28/1988
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 07/28/1988
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 07/28/1988
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 07/28/1988