Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, with respect to the Montgomery GI Bill.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/23/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
09/01/1987Executive Comment Received From DOD.
08/12/1987Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
08/06/1987Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment
08/06/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/29/1987Executive Comment Requested from VA.
07/28/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
07/28/1987Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
07/23/1987Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/1987Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/23/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 08/05/1987
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 08/06/1987
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 08/06/1987
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/21/1987
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 09/22/1987

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services07/23/1987 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation07/28/1987 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs07/23/1987 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment08/06/1987 Referred to
08/06/1987 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.3001.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3001. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/23/1987)

Directs the Administrator of Veterans Affairs to pay to the beneficiary, surviving spouse, child, or parent of a veterans who dies after June 30, 1985, while serving on active or reserve duty, a death benefit in the amount that such veteran's basic pay has been reduced by any veterans' educational assistance that has not actually been paid to such veteran.