Committees: H.R.3030 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture07/28/1987 Referred to
08/05/1987 Markup by
08/28/1987 Reported by H.Rept 100-295 Part 1
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, and Rural Development07/28/1987 Referred to
07/29/1987 Discharged from
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs08/28/1987 Referred to
09/14/1987 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce08/28/1987 Referred to
09/14/1987 Discharged from
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry10/14/1987 Referred to
12/02/1987 Discharged from