Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22]* 07/29/1987
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18]* 07/29/1987
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 07/29/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 07/30/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/30/1987
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 07/30/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/30/1987
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 07/30/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 07/30/1987
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/30/1987
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 07/30/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 07/30/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 07/30/1987
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 07/30/1987
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 07/30/1987
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 07/30/1987
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/30/1987
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 07/30/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/30/1987
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 07/30/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 07/30/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 07/30/1987
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 07/30/1987
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 07/30/1987
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 07/30/1987
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/30/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 07/30/1987
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 07/30/1987
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 07/30/1987
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 07/30/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 07/30/1987
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/30/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 07/30/1987
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 07/30/1987
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 07/30/1987
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 07/30/1987
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 07/30/1987
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 08/03/1987
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 08/03/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 08/03/1987
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 08/03/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 08/03/1987
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 08/03/1987
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 08/03/1987
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 08/04/1987
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 08/04/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 08/06/1987
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/06/1987