Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 35 of the United States Code to prohibit the patenting of genetically altered or modified animals.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
08/05/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
07/13/1988See H.R.4970.
07/13/1988Subcommittee Failed to Report to Full Committee.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice
07/13/1988Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice
08/13/1987Referred to Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
08/05/1987Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/05/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 08/05/1987
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 08/05/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 08/05/1987
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 08/05/1987
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 08/05/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 08/05/1987
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 09/29/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 09/29/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 09/29/1987
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 11/18/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 11/18/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/18/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 12/11/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 12/11/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 01/27/1988
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 01/27/1988
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 01/27/1988
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 01/27/1988
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/27/1988
Rep. Smith, Bob [R-NH-1] 01/27/1988
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/09/1988
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/09/1988
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/09/1988
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 02/09/1988
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 02/24/1988
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/24/1988
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29] 02/24/1988
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 02/24/1988
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 02/24/1988
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 02/24/1988
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 03/08/1988
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/08/1988
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 03/08/1988
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 03/08/1988
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/08/1988
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/08/1988
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 03/08/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/08/1988
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 03/08/1988
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 03/08/1988
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/15/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 03/15/1988
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 03/15/1988
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 03/15/1988
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/15/1988
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 03/15/1988
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 03/23/1988
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/23/1988
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 03/23/1988
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/23/1988
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 03/23/1988
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/23/1988
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/23/1988
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/23/1988
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 03/28/1988
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 04/13/1988
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/27/1988
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/27/1988
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 05/12/1988
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/20/1988
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 07/06/1988
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/06/1988
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 07/06/1988
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/26/1988
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 07/26/1988
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 10/20/1988

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary08/05/1987 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice08/13/1987 Referred to
07/13/1988 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3119. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/05/1987)

Amends the patent laws to prohibit for two years the patenting of animals altered through genetic engineering technology. Revokes previously granted patents for such animals.