Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Charity Games Advertising Clarification Act of 1988

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Lottery Advertising Clarification Act of 1988

Short Titles as Reported to House

Lottery Advertising Clarification Act of 1988

Short Titles as Introduced

Lottery Advertising Clarification Act of 1987

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Charity Games Advertising Clarification Act of 1988

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Charity Games Advertising Clarification Act of 1988

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to clarify certain restrictions on distribution of advertisements and other information concerning lotteries and similar activities.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
11/07/1988Became Public Law No: 100-625.
11/07/1988Signed by President.
10/27/1988Presented to President.
10/19/1988Resolving differences -- House actions: House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
10/14/1988Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
10/05/1988Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/25/1988Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/10/1988Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: Failed to Receive 2/3's Vote to Suspend and Pass by Yea-Nay Vote: 259 - 159 (Record Vote No: 115).
03/31/1988Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-557 (Part I).
08/06/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (38)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/07/1988Became Public Law No: 100-625.
11/07/1988Signed by President.
10/27/1988HousePresented to President.
10/27/1988SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/19/1988HouseHouse Agreed to Senate Amendments by Voice Vote.
10/18/1988SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/14/1988SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
10/14/1988SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
10/14/1988SenateS.Amdt.3703 Amendment SP 3703 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/14/1988SenateS.Amdt.3703 Proposed by Senator Byrd for Senator Simon. Of a technical and clarifying nature.
10/05/1988SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 1108.
10/05/1988SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Biden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
10/05/1988SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
08/05/1988SenateSubcommittee on Constitution. Approved for full committee consideration with an amendment favorably.
Action By: Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution
06/06/1988SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/26/1988SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
05/25/1988HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/25/1988HouseCalled up by House by Rule.
05/25/1988HouseRule Passed House.
05/25/1988HouseH.Amdt.717 Amendment Passed in Committee of the Whole.
05/25/1988HouseH.Amdt.716 Amendment Passed in Committee of the Whole by Voice Vote.
05/25/1988HouseH.Amdt.718 Amendment Passed in Committee of the Whole by Voice Vote.
05/25/1988HouseH.Amdt.717 Amendment Offered by Representative Frank.
05/25/1988HouseH.Amdt.716 Amendment Offered by Representative Frank.
05/25/1988HouseH.Amdt.718 Amendment Offered by Representative Wolf.
05/17/1988HouseRules Committee Resolution H.Res.448 Reported to House.
05/17/1988HouseCommittee on Rules Granted an Open Rule Providing One Hour of General Debate.
05/10/1988HouseFailed to Receive 2/3's Vote to Suspend and Pass by Yea-Nay Vote: 259 - 159 (Record Vote No: 115).
05/10/1988HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
03/31/1988HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 100-557 (Part I).
03/15/1988HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/15/1988HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
08/17/1987HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Postal Personnel and Modernization.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
08/17/1987HouseExecutive Comment Requested from OMB, US Postal Service.
08/06/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
08/06/1987HouseFor Previous Action See H.R.1568.
08/06/1987HouseReferred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
08/06/1987HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (27)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary08/06/1987 Referred to
03/15/1988 Markup by
03/31/1988 Reported by H.Rept 100-557 Part 1
House Post Office and Civil Service08/06/1987 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Postal Personnel and Modernization08/17/1987 Referred to
Senate Judiciary05/26/1988 Referred to
10/05/1988 Markup by
10/05/1988 Reported by
Senate Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution06/06/1988 Referred to
08/05/1988 Markup by
08/05/1988 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.3146. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/14/1988)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Charity Games Advertising Clarification Act of 1988 - Amends the Federal criminal code to allow the advertising of information concerning a lottery, gift enterprise, or similar scheme that is not State-conducted but is authorized or not otherwise prohibited by the State in which it is conducted, and conducted: (1) by a not-for-profit organization or a governmental organization; or (2) by a commercial organization as a promotional activity clearly occasional and ancillary to the organization's primary business.

Amends Postal Service provisions of law to provide for the mailing of such advertisements.

Makes this Act effective 18 months after the date of its enactment.