Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10]* 01/06/1987
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/22/1987
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/22/1987
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 01/22/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 01/22/1987
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 01/22/1987
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 01/22/1987
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 01/22/1987
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 01/22/1987
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 01/22/1987
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 01/22/1987
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 01/22/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 01/22/1987
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 01/22/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 01/22/1987
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large] 01/22/1987
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 01/22/1987
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 01/27/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/27/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 01/27/1987
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/27/1987
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 02/09/1987
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 02/09/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/09/1987
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 02/09/1987
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 02/09/1987
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/09/1987
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 02/09/1987
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/09/1987
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 02/09/1987
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 02/24/1987
Rep. Bartlett, Steve [R-TX-3] 02/24/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/24/1987
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/24/1987
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/24/1987