Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 08/06/1987
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 09/29/1987
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 09/29/1987
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 09/29/1987
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 09/29/1987
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 09/29/1987
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/29/1987
Rep. Bosco, Douglas H. [D-CA-1] 09/29/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 09/29/1987
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 09/29/1987
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/29/1987
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 09/29/1987
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 09/29/1987
Rep. Clarke, James McC. [D-NC-11] 09/29/1987
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 09/29/1987
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 09/29/1987
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 09/29/1987
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/29/1987
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 09/29/1987
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 09/29/1987
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 09/29/1987
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 09/29/1987
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/29/1987
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 09/29/1987
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 09/29/1987
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 09/29/1987
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 09/29/1987
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 09/29/1987
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 09/29/1987
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 09/29/1987
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/29/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/29/1987
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5] 09/29/1987
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/29/1987
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/29/1987
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-18] 09/29/1987
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 09/29/1987
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 09/29/1987
Rep. Gray, Kenneth J. [D-IL-22] 09/29/1987
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 09/29/1987
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 09/29/1987
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/29/1987
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 09/29/1987
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 09/29/1987
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 09/29/1987
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/29/1987
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 09/29/1987
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 09/29/1987
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 09/29/1987
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/29/1987
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 09/29/1987
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 09/29/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 09/29/1987
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 09/29/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 09/29/1987
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 09/29/1987
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 09/29/1987
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 09/29/1987
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-1] 09/29/1987
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28] 09/29/1987
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 09/29/1987
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 09/29/1987
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 09/29/1987
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/29/1987
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 09/29/1987
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-14] 09/29/1987
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/29/1987
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/29/1987
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/29/1987
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 09/29/1987
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/29/1987
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 09/29/1987
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 09/29/1987
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/29/1987
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 09/29/1987
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 09/29/1987
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 09/29/1987
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 09/29/1987
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/29/1987
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 09/29/1987
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/29/1987
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-21] 09/29/1987
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 09/29/1987
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 09/29/1987
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 09/29/1987
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/29/1987
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/29/1987
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/29/1987
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 09/29/1987
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/29/1987
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 09/29/1987
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 09/29/1987
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 09/29/1987
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 09/29/1987
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/29/1987
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 09/29/1987
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/29/1987
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/29/1987
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 09/29/1987
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 09/29/1987
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 09/29/1987
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 09/29/1987
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 09/29/1987
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 09/29/1987
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/29/1987
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 09/29/1987
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/29/1987
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/29/1987
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 09/29/1987
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 09/29/1987
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 09/29/1987
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 09/29/1987
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/29/1987
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 09/29/1987
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 09/29/1987
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/29/1987
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 09/29/1987
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/29/1987
Rep. Lukens, Donald E. [R-OH-8] 09/29/1987
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 09/29/1987
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-14] 09/29/1987
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 09/29/1987
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 09/29/1987
Rep. Nielson, Howard C. [R-UT-3] 09/29/1987
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 09/29/1987
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 09/29/1987
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 09/29/1987
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/29/1987
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 09/29/1987
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 10/01/1987
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 10/01/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/01/1987
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 10/01/1987
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/01/1987
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 10/01/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 10/01/1987
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 10/01/1987
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 10/01/1987
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 10/01/1987
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-8] 10/01/1987
Rep. Bates, Jim [D-CA-44] 10/01/1987
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 10/01/1987
Rep. DeWine, Mike [R-OH-7] 10/01/1987
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/01/1987
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/19/1987
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/19/1987
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 10/19/1987
Rep. Robinson, Tommy F. [D-AR-2] 10/26/1987
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 10/26/1987
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 10/26/1987
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 10/26/1987
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 10/26/1987
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 10/26/1987
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 10/26/1987
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 10/26/1987
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 10/26/1987
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 10/26/1987
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 10/28/1987
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 10/28/1987
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/28/1987
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 10/28/1987
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27] 10/28/1987
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 10/28/1987
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 10/28/1987
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 10/28/1987
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 10/28/1987
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 10/28/1987
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-19] 10/28/1987
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 10/28/1987
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 10/28/1987
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 10/28/1987
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 10/28/1987
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 10/28/1987
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 10/28/1987
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 10/28/1987
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 11/02/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 11/02/1987
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 11/02/1987
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/02/1987
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 11/02/1987
Rep. Schuette, Bill [R-MI-10] 11/02/1987
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 11/02/1987
Rep. Brennan, Joseph E. [D-ME-1] 11/09/1987
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 11/09/1987
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 11/09/1987
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 11/09/1987
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 11/09/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 11/09/1987
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 11/19/1987