Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 08/07/1987
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 10/07/1987
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 10/07/1987
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 10/07/1987
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 10/07/1987
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 10/07/1987
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 10/07/1987
Rep. Grant, Bill [D-FL-2] 10/07/1987
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-11] 10/07/1987
Rep. Morrison, Bruce A. [D-CT-3] 11/17/1987
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 11/17/1987
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 11/17/1987
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 02/09/1988
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-18] 03/09/1988
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 05/03/1988