Summary: H.R.3236 — 100th Congress (1987-1988)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for H.R.3236. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/07/1987)

Vietnam Veterans' Readjustment Counseling Program Preservation Act of 1987 - Amends Federal veterans' benefits provisions concerning administrative reorganizations within the Veterans Administration (VA) to disallow in any fiscal year the transfer or termination of 25 or more full-time equivalent employees providing readjustment counseling services, unless the Administrator of Veterans Affairs (the Administrator) first submits to appropriate congressional committees a report containing a detailed plan and justification for such reorganization.

Expands the eligibility for readjustment counseling and related mental health services (currently available only to Vietnam veterans) to include as eligible for such assistance any veteran or person who served on active-duty after May 7, 1975, in an area during a period in which hostilities occurred. Authorizes such services, upon request, to any veteran who served on active-duty during World War II or the Korean Conflict. Requires such assistance to include an assessment of whether the person or veteran has mental or psychological problems associated with such individual's active service.

Directs that professional, paraprofessional, and lay personnel trained to provide readjustment counseling services for veterans, who complete two years of continuous employment in such training program, shall be converted by the Administrator to a career-conditional or career employment status within a specified period after the completion of such training. Directs the Administrator, no later than 60 days after the enactment of this Act, to submit to the Senate and House Veterans' Affairs Committees (the Veterans' Committees) a report on the implementation of such requirement.

Prohibits any Vet Center in existence on July 1, 1987, from being closed or relocated unless the Chief Medical Director of the VA's Department of Medicine and Surgery (the Chief Medical Director): (1) determines that such closure or relocation will not adversely affect readjustment counseling services provided to eligible persons in the geographical area served by such Center; (2) in case of such a move, certifies to the Veterans' Committees in a detailed plan and justification that the average annual budget and personnel ceiling provided to such Center in each of the three fiscal years prior to such move will remain available to furnish readjustment counseling services for three full fiscal years following such move; (3) certifies in such plan that the number of personnel affected by such closure or move, together with the number of personnel affected by all other closures or moves or administrative reorganizations within the VA, will total 25 or fewer full-time equivalent employees within the same fiscal year; and (4) provides the Veterans' Committees, at least 60 days prior to any such closure or move, a detailed plan and justification which has given full consideration to certain specified factors, including the distribution of veterans in areas served by such Centers, distances required for travel to such centers, acceptability to personnel of such closures, and the availability of other entities to provide such services.

Extends until April 1, 1988, the due date of a report from the Administrator to the Veterans' Committees on the effectiveness of providing sufficient readjustment counseling services to Vietnam-era veterans.

Authorizes the Vet Centers, in addition to providing readjustment counseling services, to provide other assistance (such as benefits application assistance) that the Administrator is authorized to furnish to such veterans.

Defines "Vet Centers" as facilities operated by the VA and situated apart from VA general health-care facilities.

Amends the Veterans' Health Care Amendments of 1983 to extend until October 1, 1987, the due date of a report from the Administrator to the Veterans' Committees concerning a study of post-traumatic stress disorder and other post-war psychological problems experienced by Vietnam veterans.