Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide that the time for the payment of the manufacturers excise tax on bows, arrows and accessories will be the same as the time for payment of the excise tax on sport fishing equipment.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/09/1987Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/10/1988Provisions of Measure Incorporated Into H.R.4333.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/09/1987Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/1987Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (34)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-27]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/26/1988
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Buechner, Jack [R-MO-2]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 05/26/1988
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/08/1988
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 06/08/1988
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 06/08/1988
Rep. MacKay, Buddy [D-FL-6] 06/29/1988
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1] 06/29/1988
Rep. Rowland, John G. [R-CT-5] 06/29/1988
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 06/29/1988
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 06/29/1988
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15] 06/29/1988
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 06/29/1988
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 06/29/1988
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/29/1988
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 06/29/1988
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/26/1988 06/14/1988 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/09/1987 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3245. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/09/1987)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to provide that the manufacturers excise tax on bows, arrows, and related accessories shall be due and payable on the date for filing the appropriate return. (This provision corresponds to the treatment of sport fishing equipment under current law.)